GA HB700 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-2)
Status: Passed on May 3 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-2)
Status: Passed on May 3 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Code Section 20-3-374 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to service cancelable loan fund and authorized types of service cancelable educational loans financed by state funds and issued by the Georgia Student Finance Authority, so as to include graduate degree programs; to require application for additional educational assistance programs; to implement a two-year service requirement; to correct references; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Georgia Student Finance Authority; service cancelable educational loans; include graduate degree programs
Sponsors
Rep. Dave Belton [R] | Rep. Bill Hitchens [R] | Rep. Josh Bonner [R] | Rep. Mike Glanton [D] |
Rep. Brian Prince [D] | Rep. David Clark [R] | Sen. Ben Watson [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-03-21 - Senate - Senate Vote #644 (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-02-07 - House - House Vote #470 (Y: 156 N: 0 NV: 12 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2018-02-07 - House - House Vote #470 (Y: 156 N: 0 NV: 12 Abs: 11) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-07-01 | Effective Date | |
2018-05-03 | Act 328 | |
2018-05-03 | House | House Date Signed by Governor |
2018-04-02 | House | House Sent to Governor |
2018-03-21 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted |
2018-03-21 | Senate | Senate Third Read |
2018-03-09 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2018-03-07 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported |
2018-02-08 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2018-02-07 | House | House Passed/Adopted |
2018-02-07 | House | House Third Readers |
2018-02-01 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported |
2018-01-22 | House | House Second Readers |
2018-01-19 | House | House First Readers |
2018-01-18 | House | House Hopper |