GA HB716 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on August 4 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on August 4 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Code Section 33-24-59.23 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to carrier issuing health benefit plans to pay insurance agent's commissions and regulation authority, so as to provide that carriers issuing a health benefit plan in this state through an agent shall file proposed commission rates with the department; to provide that carriers that do not pay commission during special enrollments shall upon policy renewals pay such commission along with renewal commission; to provide for related matters; to provide for an effective date; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Insurance; carriers issuing a health benefit plan in this state through an agent shall file proposed commission rates with the department; provide
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-06-25 - Senate - Senate Vote #762 (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-02-20 - House - House Vote #468 (Y: 155 N: 6 NV: 6 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2020-02-20 - House - House Vote #468 (Y: 155 N: 6 NV: 6 Abs: 13) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-01-01 | Effective Date | |
2020-08-04 | Act 565 | |
2020-08-04 | House | House Date Signed by Governor |
2020-06-29 | House | House Sent to Governor |
2020-06-25 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted |
2020-06-25 | Senate | Senate Third Read |
2020-06-23 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2020-06-23 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported |
2020-02-21 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2020-02-20 | House | House Passed/Adopted |
2020-02-20 | House | House Third Readers |
2020-02-05 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported |
2020-01-13 | House | House Second Readers |
2019-04-02 | House | House First Readers |
2019-03-29 | House | House Hopper |