GA HB717 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Passed on May 3 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Passed on May 3 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Code Section 40-8-11 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to operational rules for autonomous vehicles, so as to provide for the applicability of certain consumer protection laws to autonomous vehicles; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Motor vehicles; applicability of certain consumer protection laws to autonomous vehicles; provide
Sponsors
Rep. Trey Kelley [R] | Rep. Christian Coomer [R] | Rep. Albert Reeves [R] | Rep. Kevin Tanner [R] |
Rep. Meagan Hanson [R] | Sen. Steve Gooch [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-03-27 - Senate - Senate Vote #737 (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-20 - House - House Vote #524 (Y: 162 N: 3 NV: 9 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2018-02-20 - House - House Vote #524 (Y: 162 N: 3 NV: 9 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-07-01 | Effective Date | |
2018-05-03 | Act 331 | |
2018-05-03 | House | House Date Signed by Governor |
2018-04-02 | House | House Sent to Governor |
2018-03-27 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted |
2018-03-27 | Senate | Senate Third Read |
2018-03-21 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2018-03-21 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported |
2018-02-21 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2018-02-20 | House | House Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2018-02-20 | House | House Third Readers |
2018-02-12 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2018-01-30 | House | House Withdrawn, Recommitted |
2018-01-23 | House | House Second Readers |
2018-01-22 | House | House First Readers |
2018-01-19 | House | House Hopper |