GA HB725 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 6-1)
Status: Passed on April 26 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-07-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 6-1)
Status: Passed on April 26 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-07-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Article 2 of Chapter 5 of Title 49 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to child abuse and deprivation records, so as to provide for greater confidentiality of child abuse records; to provide for and revise definitions; to change provisions relating to persons and agencies permitted access to records of child abuse; to provide for contents of a protective order; to provide for immunity for child advocacy centers in releasing child abuse records under certain circumstances; to provide for a short title; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
"Child Abuse Records Protection Act"; enact
Sponsors
Rep. Wesley Cantrell [R] | Rep. Jason Spencer [R] | Rep. Mandi Ballinger [R] | Rep. Tom Weldon [R] |
Rep. Stacey Evans [D] | Rep. Earl Ehrhart [R] | Sen. Charlie Bethel [R] |
Roll Calls
2016-03-14 - Senate - Senate Vote #589 (Y: 54 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-02-29 - House - House Vote #693 (Y: 170 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2016-02-29 - House - House Vote #693 (Y: 170 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-07-01 | Effective Date | |
2016-04-26 | Act 344 | |
2016-04-26 | House | House Date Signed by Governor |
2016-03-28 | House | House Sent to Governor |
2016-03-14 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted |
2016-03-14 | Senate | Senate Third Read |
2016-03-10 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2016-03-08 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported |
2016-03-02 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2016-02-29 | House | House Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2016-02-29 | House | House Third Readers |
2016-02-24 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2016-01-15 | House | House Second Readers |
2016-01-14 | House | House First Readers |
2016-01-13 | House | House Hopper |
2016-01-07 | House | House Prefiled |