GA HB736 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Engrossed on March 12 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-13 - Senate Read and Referred
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 12 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-13 - Senate Read and Referred
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Article 7 of Chapter 3 of Title 20 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to scholarships, loans, and grants for postsecondary education, so as to establish a loan forgiveness program for teachers who agree to teach in a turnaround school in a high demand subject area; to provide for requirements for participation; to provide for payment; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Education; loan forgiveness program for teachers who agree to teach in a turnaround school in a high demand subject area; establish
Sponsors
Rep. Dave Belton [R] | Rep. Mike Glanton [D] | Rep. Darlene Taylor [R] | Rep. Gerald Greene [R] |
Rep. Valencia Stovall [D] | Rep. Jeff Jones [R] |
Roll Calls
2020-03-12 - House - House Vote #630 (Y: 158 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 19) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-13 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2020-03-12 | House | House Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2020-03-12 | House | House Third Readers |
2020-03-05 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2020-01-14 | House | House Second Readers |
2020-01-13 | House | House First Readers |
2019-04-02 | House | House Hopper |