GA HB743 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Introduced on November 19 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-28 - House Second Readers
Pending: House Higher Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on November 19 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-28 - House Second Readers
Pending: House Higher Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Chapter 3 of Title 20 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to postsecondary education, so as to provide that student athletes participating in intercollegiate athletics at postsecondary educational institutions may receive compensation for the use of the student athlete's name, image, or likeness; to provide for application to athletic associations and athletic conferences; to allow for professional representation of such student athletes participating in intercollegiate athletics; to provide for definitions; to provide for related matters; to provide for an effective date; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Postsecondary education; student athletes may receive compensation for use of name, image, or likeness; provide
Sponsors
Rep. Billy Mitchell [D] | Rep. Kasey Carpenter [R] | Rep. Dewayne Hill [R] | Rep. Tom Kirby [R] |
Rep. Rick Jasperse [R] | Rep. Penny Houston [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-28 | House | House Second Readers |
2020-01-27 | House | House First Readers |
2020-01-16 | House | House Hopper |
2019-11-19 | House | House Prefiled |