GA HB761 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-2)
Status: Passed on April 15 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-07-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-2)
Status: Passed on April 15 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-07-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Chapter 20 of Title 47 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to the Public Retirement Systems Standards Law, so as to change references to certain Governmental Accounting Standards Board Statements relative to the definition of annual required contribution; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Public Retirement Systems Standards Law; definition of annual required contribution; change references
Sponsors
Rep. Lynne Riley [R] | Rep. Paul Battles [R] | Rep. David Wilkerson [D] | Rep. Gerald Greene [R] |
Rep. Debbie Buckner [D] | Rep. Tom Weldon [R] | Sen. Charlie Bethel [R] |
Roll Calls
2014-03-20 - Senate - Senate Vote #723 (Y: 53 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-02-25 - House - House Vote #586 (Y: 171 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2014-02-25 - House - House Vote #586 (Y: 171 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-07-01 | Effective Date | |
2014-04-15 | Act 508 | |
2014-04-15 | House | House Date Signed by Governor |
2014-03-26 | House | House Sent to Governor |
2014-03-20 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted |
2014-03-20 | Senate | Senate Third Read |
2014-03-20 | Senate | Senate Taken from Table |
2014-03-18 | Senate | Senate Tabled |
2014-03-12 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2014-03-12 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported |
2014-02-26 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2014-02-25 | House | House Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2014-02-25 | House | House Third Readers |
2014-02-19 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2014-01-21 | House | House Second Readers |
2014-01-17 | House | House First Readers |
2014-01-16 | House | House Hopper |