GA HB763 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 6-1)
Status: Passed on April 22 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-07-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 6-1)
Status: Passed on April 22 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-07-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Part 2 of Article 9 of Chapter 3 of Title 20 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to funding, donations, property, and scholarships with respect to the Georgia Military College, so as to revise legislative intent language regarding certain postsecondary study beyond the second year level; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Georgia Military College; legislative intent language regarding certain postsecondary study beyond second year level; revise
Sponsors
Rep. James Epps [R] | Rep. Joe Wilkinson [R] | Rep. Mike Cheokas [R] | Rep. Culver Kidd [I] |
Rep. Allen Peake [R] | Rep. Susan Holmes [R] | Sen. Burt Jones [R] |
Roll Calls
2014-03-12 - Senate - Senate Vote #615 (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2014-02-24 - House - House Vote #561 (Y: 169 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2014-02-24 - House - House Vote #561 (Y: 169 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 10) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-07-01 | Effective Date | |
2014-04-22 | Act 581 | |
2014-04-22 | House | House Date Signed by Governor |
2014-03-24 | House | House Sent to Governor |
2014-03-12 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted |
2014-03-12 | Senate | Senate Third Read |
2014-03-10 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2014-03-07 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported |
2014-02-25 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2014-02-24 | House | House Immediately Transmitted to Senate |
2014-02-24 | House | House Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2014-02-24 | House | House Third Readers |
2014-02-18 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2014-01-21 | House | House Second Readers |
2014-01-17 | House | House First Readers |
2014-01-16 | House | House Hopper |