GA HB766 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Passed on May 1 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-07-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Passed on May 1 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-07-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Article 3 of Chapter 13 of Title 45 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to the Division of Archives and History, so as to revise the provisions of law regarding Foundations of American Law and Government displays; to extend the locations in which such displays may appear; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Archives and History, Division of; law regarding Foundation of American Law and Government displays; revise provisions
Sponsors
Rep. Tommy Benton [R] | Rep. Jon Burns [R] | Rep. Terry England [R] | Sen. Bill Heath [R] |
Rep. Tom McCall [R] | Rep. John Meadows [R] | Rep. Matthew Ramsey [R] |
Roll Calls
2012-03-29 - Senate - Senate Vote #825 - Passage (Y: 41 N: 9 NV: 4 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2012-02-28 - House - House Vote #556 - Passage (Y: 161 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2012-02-28 - House - House Vote #556 - Passage (Y: 161 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 10) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-07-01 | Effective Date | |
2012-05-01 | Act 666 | |
2012-05-01 | House Date Signed by Governor | |
2012-04-03 | House Sent to Governor | |
2012-03-29 | Senate Passed/Adopted | |
2012-03-29 | Senate Third Read | |
2012-03-29 | Senate Taken from Table | |
2012-03-27 | Senate Tabled | |
2012-03-22 | Senate Read Second Time | |
2012-03-22 | Senate Committee Favorably Reported | |
2012-02-29 | Senate Read and Referred | |
2012-02-28 | House Passed/Adopted | |
2012-02-28 | House Third Readers | |
2012-02-24 | House Committee Favorably Reported | |
2012-01-25 | House Second Readers | |
2012-01-24 | House First Readers |