GA HB784 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Introduced on January 15 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-01-28 - House Committee Favorably Reported
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 15 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-01-28 - House Committee Favorably Reported
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Chapter 14 of Title 50 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to open and public meetings, so as to provide that discussions of school safety plans by members of a local board of education may be conducted in executive session; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Open and public meetings; discussions of school safety plans by members of a local board of education may be conducted in executive session; provide
Sponsors
Rep. Eddie Lumsden [R] | Rep. Rick Jasperse [R] | Rep. Bill Hitchens [R] | Rep. Mike Cheokas [R] |
Rep. Deborah Silcox [R] | Rep. Gerald Greene [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-28 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported |
2020-01-27 | House | House Second Readers |
2020-01-16 | House | House First Readers |
2020-01-15 | House | House Hopper |
Georgia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.ga.gov/legislation/56724 |
Text | https://www.legis.ga.gov/api/legislation/document/20192020/188028 |