GA HB786 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on April 29 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-07-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on April 29 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-07-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Article 1 of Chapter 2 of Title 27 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to hunting, trapping, or fishing licenses, permits, and stamps generally, so as to add a Type I nonresident infant lifetime sportsman's license; to clarify fees for replacement licenses; to correct a cross-reference; to provide for related matters; to provide an effective date; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Game and fish; Type I nonresident infant lifetime sportsman's license; add
Sponsors
Rep. David Knight [R] | Rep. Jon Burns [R] | Rep. Jay Roberts [R] | Sen. Tyler Harper [R] |
Roll Calls
2014-03-20 - House - House Vote #863 (Y: 169 N: 3 NV: 5 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2014-03-20 - Senate - Senate Vote #784 (Y: 44 N: 7 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-07 - Senate - Senate Vote #583 (Y: 48 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2014-02-06 - House - House Vote #484 (Y: 170 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2014-03-20 - Senate - Senate Vote #784 (Y: 44 N: 7 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-07 - Senate - Senate Vote #583 (Y: 48 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2014-02-06 - House - House Vote #484 (Y: 170 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-07-01 | Effective Date | |
2014-04-29 | Act 667 | |
2014-04-29 | House | House Date Signed by Governor |
2014-03-26 | House | House Sent to Governor |
2014-03-20 | Senate | Senate Conference Committee Report Adopted |
2014-03-20 | House | House Conference Committee Report Adopted |
2014-03-20 | Senate | Senate Conference Committee Appointed 7th, 17th, 20th |
2014-03-20 | House | House Conference Committee Appointed 130th, 159th, 155th |
2014-03-20 | House | House Insists |
2014-03-18 | Senate | Senate Insists |
2014-03-11 | House | House Disagrees Senate Amend/Sub |
2014-03-07 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted As Amended |
2014-03-07 | Senate | Senate Third Read |
2014-03-06 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2014-03-05 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported |
2014-02-07 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2014-02-06 | House | House Passed/Adopted |
2014-02-06 | House | House Third Readers |
2014-02-04 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported |
2014-01-23 | House | House Second Readers |
2014-01-22 | House | House First Readers |
2014-01-21 | House | House Hopper |