GA HB79 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Passed on May 8 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Passed on May 8 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Chapter 1 of Title 35 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to general provisions regarding law enforcement officers and agencies, so as to prohibit law enforcement from retaining license plate data obtained from automated license plate recognition systems beyond a certain period; to provide for definitions; to provide for the exchange of data obtained from license plate recognition systems by law enforcement; to provide for criminal penalties for misuse of captured license plate data; to provide for policies; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Law enforcement; retaining license plate data obtained from automated license plate recognition systems beyond certain periods; prohibit
Sponsors
Rep. John Pezold [R] | Rep. Alan Powell [R] | Rep. Michael Caldwell [R] | Rep. Rick Jasperse [R] |
Rep. Buzz Brockway [R] | Rep. Scot Turner [R] | Sen. John Albers [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-03-12 - Senate - Senate Vote #596 (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2018-02-13 - House - House Vote #492 (Y: 169 N: 2 NV: 3 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2018-02-13 - House - House Vote #492 (Y: 169 N: 2 NV: 3 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-07-01 | Effective Date | |
2018-05-08 | Act 452 | |
2018-05-08 | House | House Date Signed by Governor |
2018-04-02 | House | House Sent to Governor |
2018-03-12 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted |
2018-03-12 | Senate | Senate Third Read |
2018-03-09 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2018-03-07 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported |
2018-02-14 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2018-02-13 | House | House Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2018-02-13 | House | House Third Readers |
2018-02-05 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2017-03-30 | House | House Withdrawn, Recommitted |
2017-02-27 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2017-01-25 | House | House Second Readers |
2017-01-24 | House | House First Readers |
2017-01-23 | House | House Hopper |