GA HB790 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 28 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-01-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 28 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-01-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend an Act creating a new charter for the City of Doraville, approved October 13, 1971 (Ga. L. 1971, Ex. Sess., p. 2154), as amended, particularly by an Act approved March 10, 1983 (Ga. L. 1983, p. 3581), so as to provide municipal judges with certain authorities regarding the sentencing of local offenders; to provide for the selection of the mayor-pro tem; to provide for municipal elections; to provide for appeals procedure for municipal court decisions; to provide that the city attorney may not serve as the municipal court judge; to provide for qualifying fees for municipal office; to provide for municipal elections; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Doraville, City of; municipal elections; provisions
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-01-01 | Effective Date | |
2010-05-28 | Act 536 | |
2010-05-28 | House Date Signed by Governor | |
2010-05-10 | House Sent to Governor | |
2010-04-29 | House Agree Senate Amend or Sub | |
2010-04-27 | Senate Passed/Adopted | |
2010-04-27 | Senate Committee Favorably Reported | |
2010-04-20 | Senate Read and Referred | |
2010-04-14 | House Passed/Adopted | |
2010-04-14 | House Third Readers | |
2010-04-14 | House Committee Favorably Reported | |
2009-03-25 | House Second Readers | |
2009-03-23 | House First Readers |