GA HB790 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Passed on April 24 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-07-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Passed on April 24 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-07-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Article 2 of Chapter 3 of Title 9 of the O.C.G.A., relating to specific periods of limitation, so as to provide for a four-year statute of limitations for actions involving the removal of timber from the property of another; to amend Part 1 of Article 1 of Chapter 6 of Title 12 of the O.C.G.A., relating to the State Forestry Commission; to amend Code Section 12-6-23 of the O.C.G.A., relating to wood load ticket required for wood removal; to amend Chapter 4 of Title 44 of the O.C.G.A., relating to real estate boundary determinations, so as to repeal provisions relating to processioning; to amend Title 51 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to torts; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Civil practice; four-year statute of limitations for actions involving removal of timber from the property of another; provisions
Sponsors
Rep. Charles Williams [R] | Rep. Wendell Willard [R] | Rep. Rich Golick [R] | Sen. Ellis Black [R] |
Rep. Chad Nimmer [R] | Rep. Lynn Smith [R] | Sen. Bill Cowsert [R] |
Roll Calls
2014-03-13 - House - House Vote #778 (Y: 158 N: 2 NV: 12 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2014-03-11 - Senate - Senate Vote #610 (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2014-02-20 - House - House Vote #539 (Y: 169 N: 2 NV: 4 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2014-03-11 - Senate - Senate Vote #610 (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2014-02-20 - House - House Vote #539 (Y: 169 N: 2 NV: 4 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-07-01 | Effective Date | |
2014-04-24 | Act 619 | |
2014-04-24 | House | House Date Signed by Governor |
2014-03-24 | House | House Sent to Governor |
2014-03-13 | House | House Agrees Senate Amend or Sub |
2014-03-11 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2014-03-11 | Senate | Senate Third Read |
2014-03-10 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2014-03-07 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2014-02-21 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2014-02-20 | House | House Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2014-02-20 | House | House Third Readers |
2014-02-18 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2014-01-23 | House | House Second Readers |
2014-01-22 | House | House First Readers |
2014-01-21 | House | House Hopper |