GA HB799 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-2)
Status: Passed on July 29 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-07-29 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-2)
Status: Passed on July 29 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-07-29 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Article 3A of Chapter 5 of Title 40 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to suspension of license for being in control of a moving vehicle under the influence of a controlled substance or marijuana, so as to repeal a prohibition regarding the eligibility of certain violators to receive early reinstatement of their driver's licenses and limited driving permits; to provide for related matters; to provide for an effective date; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Motor vehicles; prohibition regarding eligibility of certain violators to receive early reinstatement of their driver's licenses and limited driving permits; repeal
Sponsors
Rep. Shaw Blackmon [R] | Rep. Steven Sainz [R] | Rep. Dar'shun Kendrick [D] | Rep. John Corbett [R] |
Rep. Trey Kelley [R] | Rep. Mary Oliver [D] | Sen. Jesse Stone [R] |
Roll Calls
2020-06-22 - Senate - Senate Vote #682 (Y: 44 N: 3 NV: 3 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2020-02-26 - House - House Vote #484 (Y: 159 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 16) [PASS]
2020-02-26 - House - House Vote #484 (Y: 159 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 16) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-07-29 | Effective Date | |
2020-07-29 | Act 494 | |
2020-07-29 | House | House Date Signed by Governor |
2020-06-29 | House | House Sent to Governor |
2020-06-22 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted |
2020-06-22 | Senate | Senate Third Read |
2020-06-16 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2020-06-15 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported |
2020-02-27 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2020-02-26 | House | House Passed/Adopted |
2020-02-26 | House | House Third Readers |
2020-02-21 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported |
2020-01-28 | House | House Second Readers |
2020-01-27 | House | House First Readers |
2020-01-16 | House | House Hopper |