GA HB8 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on December 5 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-01-29 - House Withdrawn, Recommitted
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on December 5 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-01-29 - House Withdrawn, Recommitted
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Chapter 8 of Title 48 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to sales and use taxes, so as to create an exemption from state sales and use tax for certain menstrual products; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Sales and use tax; certain menstrual products; create exemption
Sponsors
Rep. Debbie Buckner [D] | Rep. Robert Trammell [D] | Rep. Ron Stephens [R] | Rep. Karen Mathiak [R] |
Rep. Penny Houston [R] | Rep. Teri Anulewicz [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-29 | House | House Withdrawn, Recommitted |
2019-01-17 | House | House Second Readers |
2019-01-16 | House | House First Readers |
2019-01-15 | House | House Hopper |
2018-12-05 | House | House Prefiled |