GA HB807 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 10 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-06-23 - Senate Read Second Time
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 10 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-06-23 - Senate Read Second Time
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Code Section 48-13-14 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to levy on business or practitioner with location or office in more than one jurisdiction, methods of allocating gross receipts, information provided by business or practitioner, and limits on levies by local governments using criteria for taxation, so as to allow businesses and practitioners to provide affidavits of certified public accountants in lieu of tax returns; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Revenue and taxation; allow businesses to provide affidavits of certified public accountants in lieu of tax returns
Sponsors
Rep. Martin Momtahan [R] | Rep. Alan Powell [R] | Rep. James Hatchett [R] | Rep. Kevin Tanner [R] |
Rep. Bill Yearta [R] | Rep. David Knight [R] | Sen. Randy Robertson [R] |
Roll Calls
2020-03-10 - House - House Vote #559 (Y: 111 N: 51 NV: 5 Abs: 13) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-23 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2020-06-23 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2020-03-12 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2020-03-10 | House | House Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2020-03-10 | House | House Third Readers |
2020-02-21 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2020-01-29 | House | House Second Readers |
2020-01-28 | House | House First Readers |
2020-01-27 | House | House Hopper |