GA HB808 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Passed on July 29 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Passed on July 29 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Chapter 5C of Title 48 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to alternative ad valorem taxes on motor vehicles, so as to revise a definition; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Alternative ad valorem tax; motor vehicles; revise a definition
Sponsors
Rep. Martin Momtahan [R] | Rep. Alan Powell [R] | Rep. Kevin Tanner [R] | Rep. John Corbett [R] |
Rep. James Hatchett [R] | Sen. Tyler Harper [R] |
Roll Calls
2020-06-17 - Senate - Senate Vote #646 (Y: 54 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-27 - House - House Vote #490 (Y: 150 N: 1 NV: 8 Abs: 21) [PASS]
2020-02-27 - House - House Vote #490 (Y: 150 N: 1 NV: 8 Abs: 21) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-01-01 | Effective Date | |
2020-07-29 | Act 495 | |
2020-07-29 | House | House Date Signed by Governor |
2020-06-29 | House | House Sent to Governor |
2020-06-17 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted |
2020-06-17 | Senate | Senate Third Read |
2020-06-17 | Senate | Senate Engrossed |
2020-03-13 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2020-03-12 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported |
2020-02-28 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2020-02-27 | House | House Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2020-02-27 | House | House Third Readers |
2020-02-21 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2020-01-29 | House | House Second Readers |
2020-01-28 | House | House First Readers |
2020-01-27 | House | House Hopper |