GA HB820 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Passed on August 5 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Passed on August 5 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Article 3 of Chapter 2 of Title 32 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to officers in the Department of Transportation, so as to provide for state investment in railways and railroad facilities and equipment; to provide for a definition; to provide that the commissioner of transportation may administer a Georgia Freight Railroad Program; to provide for subprograms within such program; to provide for annual reporting; to provide for standards for expenditure of funds; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Transportation, Department of; state investment in railways and railroad facilities and equipment; provide
Sponsors
Rep. Kevin Tanner [R] | Rep. Calvin Smyre [D] | Rep. Kasey Carpenter [R] | Rep. Tom McCall [R] |
Rep. Alan Powell [R] | Sen. Steve Gooch [R] |
Roll Calls
2020-06-17 - Senate - Senate Vote #647 (Y: 54 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-24 - House - House Vote #475 (Y: 162 N: 1 NV: 4 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2020-02-24 - House - House Vote #475 (Y: 162 N: 1 NV: 4 Abs: 13) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-01-01 | Effective Date | |
2020-08-05 | Act 593 | |
2020-08-05 | House | House Date Signed by Governor |
2020-06-29 | House | House Sent to Governor |
2020-06-17 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted |
2020-06-17 | Senate | Senate Third Read |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported |
2020-02-25 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2020-02-24 | House | House Passed/Adopted |
2020-02-24 | House | House Third Readers |
2020-01-31 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported |
2020-01-29 | House | House Second Readers |
2020-01-28 | House | House First Readers |
2020-01-27 | House | House Hopper |