GA HB821 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 12 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-13 - Senate Read and Referred
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 12 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-13 - Senate Read and Referred
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Title 47 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to retirement and pensions, so as to remove the prohibition of granting postretirement benefit adjustments to any individual who became a member on or after July 1, 2009, of the Employees' Retirement System of Georgia, the Georgia Legislative Retirement System, or the Georgia Judicial Retirement System; to allow for the possibility of such adjustments for such members granted on or after July 1, 2020; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Retirement and pensions; granting postretirement benefit adjustments to certain individuals; provisions
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-12 - House - House Vote #610 (Y: 92 N: 66 NV: 7 Abs: 15) [PASS]
2020-03-12 - House - House Vote #611 (Y: 67 N: 91 NV: 7 Abs: 15) [FAIL]
2020-03-12 - House - House Vote #611 (Y: 67 N: 91 NV: 7 Abs: 15) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-13 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2020-03-12 | House | House Passed/Adopted |
2020-03-12 | House | House Third Readers |
2020-02-05 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported |
2020-01-29 | House | House Second Readers |
2020-01-28 | House | House First Readers |
2020-01-27 | House | House Hopper |