GA HB829 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 3 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-04 - Senate Read and Referred
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 3 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-04 - Senate Read and Referred
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Code Section 48-5-7 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to assessment of tangible property, so as to provide for local referenda to authorize assessment of residential homesteaded property owned by individuals who are 65 years of age or older at 20 percent of its fair market value regarding local school district taxes for educational purposes; to provide for a contingent effective date; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Local school district tax; authorize assessment of residential homesteaded property owned by individuals of 65 years of age or older at 20 percent of its fair market value; provide for local referenda
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-03 - House - House Vote #511 (Y: 157 N: 6 NV: 9 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-04 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2020-03-03 | House | House Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2020-03-03 | House | House Third Readers |
2020-02-28 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2020-01-30 | House | House Second Readers |
2020-01-29 | House | House First Readers |
2020-01-28 | House | House Hopper |