GA HB834 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Passed on May 8 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Passed on May 8 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Article 1 of Chapter 7 of Title 44 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to general provisions concerning landlord and tenant, so as to provide for the termination of a rental or lease agreement for residential real estate under circumstances involving family violence; to provide for definitions; to provide for notice and terms of termination; to provide for applicability; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Landlord and tenant; termination of a rental or lease agreement under circumstances involving family violence; provide
Sponsors
Rep. Mandi Ballinger [R] | Rep. Beth Beskin [R] | Rep. Shaw Blackmon [R] | Rep. Scott Hilton [R] |
Rep. John Corbett [R] | Rep. Katie Dempsey [R] | Sen. Jesse Stone [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-03-29 - House - House Vote #830 (Y: 166 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-03-27 - Senate - Senate Vote #696 (Y: 53 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-28 - House - House Vote #637 (Y: 166 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2018-03-27 - Senate - Senate Vote #696 (Y: 53 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-28 - House - House Vote #637 (Y: 166 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-07-01 | Effective Date | |
2018-05-08 | Act 482 | |
2018-05-08 | House | House Date Signed by Governor |
2018-04-05 | House | House Sent to Governor |
2018-03-29 | House | House Agreed Senate Amend or Sub |
2018-03-27 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2018-03-27 | Senate | Senate Third Read |
2018-03-19 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2018-03-15 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2018-02-28 | House | House Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2018-02-28 | House | House Third Readers |
2018-02-22 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2018-02-07 | House | House Second Readers |
2018-02-06 | House | House First Readers |
2018-02-05 | House | House Hopper |