GA HB842 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Engrossed on February 28 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-03-02 - Senate Read and Referred
Pending: Senate Health and Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Chapter 1 of Title 31 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to general provisions regarding health, so as to prohibit providers from discriminating against potential organ transplant recipients due solely to the physical or mental disability of the potential recipient; to amend Chapter 24 of Title 33 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to insurance generally, so as to prohibit health insurers from discriminating against potential organ transplant recipients due solely to the physical or mental disability of the potential recipient; to provide for a short title; to provide for legislative findings; to provide for applicability; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Gracie's Law; enact

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-02-28 - House - House Vote #494 (Y: 160 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 19) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-02SenateSenate Read and Referred
2020-02-28HouseHouse Passed/Adopted By Substitute
2020-02-28HouseHouse Third Readers
2020-02-20HouseHouse Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
2020-01-31HouseHouse Second Readers
2020-01-30HouseHouse First Readers
2020-01-29HouseHouse Hopper

Georgia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback