GA HB844 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-2)
Status: Passed on April 26 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-07-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-2)
Status: Passed on April 26 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-07-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Chapter 7 of Title 47 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to the Georgia Firefighters' Pension Fund, so as to update certain provisions related to determining which insurance premiums are subject to taxation related to the fund; to provide that venue for any action brought in the superior court against the fund or the board shall be in the superior court of the board's county of domicile; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Georgia Firefighters' Pension Fund; insurance premiums subject to taxation; update certain provisions
Sponsors
Rep. Howard Maxwell [R] | Rep. Rick Jasperse [R] | Rep. Debbie Buckner [D] | Rep. Gerald Greene [R] |
Rep. Paulette Rakestraw [R] | Rep. Micah Gravley [R] | Sen. Freddie Sims [D] |
Roll Calls
2016-03-10 - Senate - Senate Vote #573 (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-02-10 - House - House Vote #515 (Y: 163 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2016-02-10 - House - House Vote #515 (Y: 163 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 13) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-07-01 | Effective Date | |
2016-04-26 | Act 457 | |
2016-04-26 | House | House Date Signed by Governor |
2016-03-28 | House | House Sent to Governor |
2016-03-10 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted |
2016-03-10 | Senate | Senate Third Read |
2016-02-25 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2016-02-24 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported |
2016-02-11 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2016-02-10 | House | House Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2016-02-10 | House | House Third Readers |
2016-02-04 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2016-01-28 | House | House Second Readers |
2016-01-27 | House | House First Readers |
2016-01-26 | House | House Hopper |