GA HB846 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Passed on June 30 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-30 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Passed on June 30 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-30 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Title 48 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to revenue and taxation, so as to provide that interest paid on refunds of overpayments of taxes and past due taxes shall be equal to the bank prime loan rate; to allow political subdivisions to make an election related repayment of certain final refund amounts being made over a period of time; to require the Department of Revenue to establish and maintain a direct pay permit program that permits a qualified taxpayer to accrue and pay directly to the department certain state and local sales and use taxes; to provide definitions; to provide for related matters; to provide for an effective date and applicability; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Revenue and taxation; interest paid on refunds of overpayments of taxes and past due taxes shall be equal to the bank prime loan rate; provide
Sponsors
Rep. John Corbett [R] | Rep. Brett Harrell [R] | Rep. John Carson [R] | Rep. Trey Kelley [R] |
Rep. Bruce Williamson [R] | Sen. Chuck Hufstetler [R] |
Roll Calls
2020-06-26 - House - House Vote #775 (Y: 110 N: 58 NV: 4 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2020-06-25 - Senate - Senate Vote #753 (Y: 46 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2020-02-27 - House - House Vote #489 (Y: 148 N: 3 NV: 10 Abs: 19) [PASS]
2020-06-25 - Senate - Senate Vote #753 (Y: 46 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2020-02-27 - House - House Vote #489 (Y: 148 N: 3 NV: 10 Abs: 19) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-30 | Effective Date | |
2020-06-30 | Act 411 | |
2020-06-30 | House | House Date Signed by Governor |
2020-06-29 | House | House Sent to Governor |
2020-06-26 | House | House Agreed Senate Amend or Sub |
2020-06-25 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2020-06-25 | Senate | Senate Third Read |
2020-06-25 | Senate | Senate Engrossed |
2020-06-25 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2020-06-24 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2020-06-20 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2020-06-19 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2020-02-28 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2020-02-27 | House | House Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2020-02-27 | House | House Third Readers |
2020-02-25 | House | House Withdrawn, Recommitted |
2020-02-21 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2020-01-31 | House | House Second Readers |
2020-01-30 | House | House First Readers |
2020-01-29 | House | House Hopper |