GA HB847 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Engrossed on February 23 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-26 - Senate Read and Referred
Pending: Senate Health and Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 23 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-26 - Senate Read and Referred
Pending: Senate Health and Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Chapter 39 of Title 43 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to psychologists, so as to enter into an interstate compact known as the "Psychology Interjurisdictional Compact"; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Psychology Interjurisdictional Compact; enter into an interstate compact
Sponsors
Rep. Joyce Chandler [R] | Rep. Patricia Gardner [D] | Rep. Lee Hawkins [R] | Rep. Karen Mathiak [R] |
Rep. Howard Maxwell [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-02-23 - House - House Vote #559 (Y: 171 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-26 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2018-02-23 | House | House Passed/Adopted |
2018-02-23 | House | House Third Readers |
2018-02-21 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported |
2018-02-08 | House | House Second Readers |
2018-02-07 | House | House First Readers |
2018-02-06 | House | House Hopper |
Georgia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.ga.gov/legislation/52539 |
Text | https://www.legis.ga.gov/api/legislation/document/20172018/172527 |
Roll Call | https://www.legis.ga.gov/legislation/52539#15750 |