GA HB848 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-2)
Status: Passed on July 29 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-2)
Status: Passed on July 29 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Article 4 of Chapter 5 of Title 50 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to disposition of surplus property, so as to change certain definitions to provide the Department of Administrative Services additional options when disposing of surplus property in the best interest of the state; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
State government; provide the Department of Administrative Services additional options when disposing of surplus property in the best interest of the state; change certain definitions
Sponsors
Rep. Shaw Blackmon [R] | Sen. Ricky Williams [R] | Rep. Eddie Lumsden [R] | Rep. Darlene Taylor [R] |
Rep. Renitta Shannon [D] | Rep. Mary Oliver [D] | Sen. Tyler Harper [R] |
Roll Calls
2020-06-22 - Senate - Senate Vote #681 (Y: 44 N: 3 NV: 3 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2020-03-12 - House - House Vote #591 (Y: 167 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2020-03-12 - House - House Vote #591 (Y: 167 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 10) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-01-01 | Effective Date | |
2020-07-29 | Act 496 | |
2020-07-29 | House | House Date Signed by Governor |
2020-06-29 | House | House Sent to Governor |
2020-06-22 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted |
2020-06-22 | Senate | Senate Third Read |
2020-06-19 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2020-06-18 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported |
2020-06-16 | Senate | Senate Withdrawn & Recommitted |
2020-03-13 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2020-03-12 | House | House Passed/Adopted |
2020-03-12 | House | House Third Readers |
2020-03-05 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported |
2020-01-31 | House | House Second Readers |
2020-01-30 | House | House First Readers |
2020-01-29 | House | House Hopper |