GA HB85 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 25 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-02 - House Disagreed Senate Amend or Sub
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 25 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-02 - House Disagreed Senate Amend or Sub
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Code Section 48-8-3 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to exemptions from sales and use tax, so as to exempt sales to organ procurement organizations from sales and use tax; to provide for an annual report; to provide for related matters; to provide for applicability; to provide for automatic repeal; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Sales and use tax; organ procurement organizations; exempt sales
Sponsors
Rep. Penny Houston [R] | Rep. Mark Newton [R] | Rep. John Corbett [R] | Rep. Trey Rhodes [R] |
Rep. J Collins [R] | Sen. Chuck Hufstetler [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-04-02 - Senate - Senate Vote #383 (Y: 47 N: 5 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-03-29 - Senate - Senate Vote #355 (Y: 35 N: 19 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-25 - House - House Vote #66 (Y: 171 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-03-29 - Senate - Senate Vote #355 (Y: 35 N: 19 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-25 - House - House Vote #66 (Y: 171 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-02 | House | House Disagreed Senate Amend or Sub |
2019-04-02 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2019-04-02 | Senate | Senate Third Read |
2019-04-02 | Senate | Senate Taken from Table |
2019-03-29 | Senate | Senate Tabled |
2019-03-29 | Senate | Senate Engrossed |
2019-03-29 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2019-03-26 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2019-03-13 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported |
2019-02-26 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2019-02-25 | House | House Passed/Adopted |
2019-02-25 | House | House Third Readers |
2019-02-22 | House | House Postponed |
2019-02-21 | House | House Postponed |
2019-02-15 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported |
2019-02-05 | House | House Second Readers |
2019-01-30 | House | House First Readers |
2019-01-29 | House | House Hopper |