GA HB852 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-2)
Status: Passed on May 7 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-2)
Status: Passed on May 7 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Part 13 of Article 6 of Chapter 2 of Title 20 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to organization of schools and school systems under the "Quality Basic Education Act," so as to provide for a student's continued enrollment in a public school under certain circumstances; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Quality Basic Education Act; student's continued enrollment in a public school under certain circumstances; provide
Sponsors
Rep. Michael Smith [D] | Rep. Gerald Greene [R] | Rep. Rhonda Burnough [D] | Rep. Brenda Lopez Romero [D] |
Rep. Doreen Carter [D] | Sen. Francis Millar [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-03-19 - Senate - Senate Vote #632 (Y: 53 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-02-28 - House - House Vote #654 (Y: 169 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2018-02-28 - House - House Vote #654 (Y: 169 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-07-01 | Effective Date | |
2018-05-07 | Act 431 | |
2018-05-07 | House | House Date Signed by Governor |
2018-04-03 | House | House Sent to Governor |
2018-03-19 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted |
2018-03-19 | Senate | Senate Third Read |
2018-03-15 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2018-03-14 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2018-02-28 | House | House Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2018-02-28 | House | House Third Readers |
2018-02-15 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2018-02-08 | House | House Second Readers |
2018-02-07 | House | House First Readers |
2018-02-06 | House | House Hopper |