GA HB855 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Passed on July 29 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Part 3 of Article 6 of Chapter 2 of Title 20 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to educational programs, so as to direct the State Board of Education to determine eligibility criteria for foster care students to receive special education and related services; to require the Department of Education to provide guidance to local school systems; to require local school systems to immediately determine whether to initiate the initial evaluation process for newly enrolled foster care students; to require the State Board of Education to develop rules and regulations; to provide for definitions; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

State Board of Education; determine eligibility criteria for foster care students to receive special education and related services; provisions

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-06-26 - House - House Vote #781 (Y: 164 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2020-06-25 - Senate - Senate Vote #766 (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-03-05 - House - House Vote #538 (Y: 166 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 13) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-07-01 Effective Date
2020-07-29 Act 497
2020-07-29HouseHouse Date Signed by Governor
2020-06-30HouseHouse Sent to Governor
2020-06-26HouseHouse Agreed Senate Amend or Sub
2020-06-25SenateSenate Passed/Adopted As Amended
2020-06-25SenateSenate Third Read
2020-06-24SenateSenate Read Second Time
2020-06-24SenateSenate Committee Favorably Reported
2020-03-09SenateSenate Read and Referred
2020-03-05HouseHouse Passed/Adopted By Substitute
2020-03-05HouseHouse Third Readers
2020-02-28HouseHouse Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
2020-02-03HouseHouse Second Readers
2020-01-31HouseHouse First Readers
2020-01-30HouseHouse Hopper

Georgia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback