GA HB861 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Passed on June 29 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-29 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Passed on June 29 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-29 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Chapter 1 of Title 40 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to identification and regulation of motor vehicles, so as to amend certain definitions relating to commercial carriers; to provide for an effective date; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Motor vehicles; commercial carriers; amend certain definitions
Sponsors
Rep. Marcus Wiedower [R] | Rep. Jan Jones [R] | Rep. Micah Gravley [R] | Rep. Houston Gaines [R] |
Rep. Matt Barton [R] | Rep. Dale Washburn [R] | Sen. Tyler Harper [R] |
Roll Calls
2020-06-20 - Senate - Senate Vote #665 (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2020-03-02 - House - House Vote #507 (Y: 163 N: 2 NV: 3 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2020-03-02 - House - House Vote #507 (Y: 163 N: 2 NV: 3 Abs: 12) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-29 | Effective Date | |
2020-06-29 | Act 374 | |
2020-06-29 | House | House Date Signed by Governor |
2020-06-25 | House | House Sent to Governor |
2020-06-20 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted |
2020-06-20 | Senate | Senate Third Read |
2020-06-19 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2020-06-18 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2020-03-02 | House | House Passed/Adopted |
2020-03-02 | House | House Third Readers |
2020-02-27 | House | House Withdrawn, Recommitted |
2020-02-21 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported |
2020-02-03 | House | House Second Readers |
2020-01-31 | House | House First Readers |
2020-01-30 | House | House Hopper |