GA HB865 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Passed on July 29 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Passed on July 29 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Title 53 of the O.C.G.A., relating to wills, trusts, and administration of estates; to amend Part 12 of Article 1 of Chapter 1 of Title 7 of the O.C.G.A., relating to deposits of deceased depositors; to amend Title 9 of the O.C.G.A., relating to civil practice; to amend Title 10 of the O.C.G.A., relating to commerce and trade; to amend Article 2 of Chapter 5 of Title 13 of the O.C.G.A., relating to statute of frauds; to amend Chapter 9 of Title 15 of the O.C.G.A., relating to probate courts; to amend Title 19 of the O.C.G.A., relating to domestic relations; to amend Article 3 of Chapter 2 of Title 23 of the O.C.G.A., relating to fraud; to amend Chapter 27 of Title 50 of the O.C.G.A., relating to lottery for education; to provide for related matters; to provide for an effective date; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Wills, trusts, and administration of estates; Revised Probate Code of 1998; revise and update provisions
Sponsors
Rep. Mitchell Scoggins [R] | Rep. Bonnie Rich [R] | Rep. Barry Fleming [R] | Rep. Deborah Silcox [R] |
Rep. David Dreyer [D] | Sen. Jesse Stone [R] |
Roll Calls
2020-06-25 - House - House Vote #742 (Y: 154 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 15) [PASS]
2020-06-22 - Senate - Senate Vote #689 (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2020-03-12 - House - House Vote #608 (Y: 150 N: 12 NV: 3 Abs: 15) [PASS]
2020-06-22 - Senate - Senate Vote #689 (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2020-03-12 - House - House Vote #608 (Y: 150 N: 12 NV: 3 Abs: 15) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-01-01 | Effective Date | |
2020-07-29 | Act 508 | |
2020-07-29 | House | House Date Signed by Governor |
2020-07-02 | House | House Sent to Governor |
2020-06-25 | House | House Agreed Senate Amend or Sub |
2020-06-22 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2020-06-22 | Senate | Senate Third Read |
2020-06-19 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2020-06-18 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2020-06-15 | Senate | Senate Withdrawn & Recommitted |
2020-03-13 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2020-03-12 | House | House Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2020-03-12 | House | House Third Readers |
2020-03-04 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2020-02-05 | House | House Withdrawn, Recommitted |
2020-02-04 | House | House Second Readers |
2020-02-03 | House | House First Readers |
2020-01-31 | House | House Hopper |