GA HB869 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on April 27 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-07-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on April 27 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-07-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Chapter 40 of Title 43 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to real estate brokers and salespersons, so as to change certain provisions relating to the responsibilities of brokers and qualifying brokers to review certain documents; to change certain provisions relating to actions that constitute unfair trade practices; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Professions and businesses; responsibilities of brokers and qualifying brokers to review certain documents; change certain provisions
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-03-22 - Senate - Senate Vote #659 (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2016-02-17 - House - House Vote #549 (Y: 170 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2016-02-17 - House - House Vote #549 (Y: 170 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-07-01 | Effective Date | |
2016-04-27 | Act 463 | |
2016-04-27 | House | House Date Signed by Governor |
2016-03-29 | House | House Sent to Governor |
2016-03-22 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted |
2016-03-22 | Senate | Senate Third Read |
2016-03-10 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2016-03-08 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported |
2016-02-18 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2016-02-17 | House | House Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2016-02-17 | House | House Third Readers |
2016-02-09 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2016-02-02 | House | House Second Readers |
2016-02-01 | House | House First Readers |
2016-01-28 | House | House Hopper |