GA HB872 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Passed on April 17 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-07-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Passed on April 17 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-07-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Chapter 5 of Title 24 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to privileges, so as to create a privileged communication between law enforcement officers and peer counselors under certain circumstances; to provide for definitions; to provide for exceptions; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Evidence; privileged communication between law enforcement and peer counselors under certain circumstances; create
Sponsors
Rep. Terry Rogers [R] | Rep. Bill Hitchens [R] | Rep. Eddie Lumsden [R] | Rep. Tommy Benton [R] |
Rep. Alan Powell [R] | Rep. Tom Kirby [R] | Sen. Jeff Mullis [R] |
Roll Calls
2014-03-18 - Senate - Senate Vote #662 (Y: 52 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-02-25 - House - House Vote #595 (Y: 160 N: 3 NV: 9 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2014-02-25 - House - House Vote #595 (Y: 160 N: 3 NV: 9 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-07-01 | Effective Date | |
2014-04-17 | Act 542 | |
2014-04-17 | House | House Date Signed by Governor |
2014-03-26 | House | House Sent to Governor |
2014-03-18 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted |
2014-03-18 | Senate | Senate Third Read |
2014-03-18 | Senate | Senate Taken from Table |
2014-03-18 | Senate | Senate Tabled |
2014-03-12 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2014-03-12 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported |
2014-03-07 | Senate | Senate Withdrawn & Recommitted |
2014-02-26 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2014-02-25 | House | House Passed/Adopted |
2014-02-25 | House | House Third Readers |
2014-02-21 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported |
2014-02-05 | House | House Withdrawn, Recommitted |
2014-02-03 | House | House Second Readers |
2014-01-31 | House | House First Readers |
2014-01-28 | House | House Hopper |