GA HB877 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Passed on April 25 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-07-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Passed on April 25 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-07-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Title 40 of the O.C.G.A., relating to motor vehicles, so as to provide local authorities with the ability to regulate the use of personal transportation vehicles upon roadways and designated paths and lanes; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Motor vehicles; local authorities ability to regulate use of personal transportation vehicles on roadways and designated paths and lanes; provide
Sponsors
Rep. Jay Roberts [R] | Rep. Barbara Sims [R] | Rep. Benjie Harbin [R] | Rep. Brian Prince [D] |
Rep. Lynn Smith [R] | Sen. Steve Gooch [R] |
Roll Calls
2014-03-20 - Senate - Senate Vote #721 (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-20 - House - House Vote #850 (Y: 160 N: 2 NV: 12 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2014-02-10 - House - House Vote #496 (Y: 165 N: 1 NV: 7 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2014-03-20 - House - House Vote #850 (Y: 160 N: 2 NV: 12 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2014-02-10 - House - House Vote #496 (Y: 165 N: 1 NV: 7 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-07-01 | Effective Date | |
2014-04-25 | Act 629 | |
2014-04-25 | House | House Date Signed by Governor |
2014-03-27 | House | House Sent to Governor |
2014-03-20 | House | House Agrees Senate Amend or Sub |
2014-03-20 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2014-03-20 | Senate | Senate Third Read |
2014-03-20 | Senate | Senate Taken from Table |
2014-03-18 | Senate | Senate Tabled |
2014-03-10 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2014-03-07 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2014-02-11 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2014-02-10 | House | House Passed/Adopted |
2014-02-10 | House | House Third Readers |
2014-02-06 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported |
2014-02-03 | House | House Second Readers |
2014-01-31 | House | House First Readers |
2014-01-28 | House | House Hopper |