GA HB89 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Introduced on January 29 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-02 - House Withdrawn, Recommitted
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 29 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-02 - House Withdrawn, Recommitted
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Chapter 6 of Title 31 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to state health planning and development, so as to provide for an exemption for integrated ambulatory surgery centers from certificate of need requirements; to provide for a definition; to provide for conditions; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
State health planning and development; integrated ambulatory surgery centers; provide exemption from certificate of need requirements
Sponsors
Rep. Charles Martin [R] | Rep. Jay Powell [R] | Rep. Terry England [R] | Rep. Jon Burns [R] |
Rep. Spencer Frye [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-02 | House | House Withdrawn, Recommitted |
2019-03-05 | House | House Postponed |
2019-03-01 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2019-02-05 | House | House Second Readers |
2019-01-30 | House | House First Readers |
2019-01-29 | House | House Hopper |