GA HB890 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Passed on May 3 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Passed on May 3 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Article 2 of Chapter 11 of Title 16 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to offenses against public order, so as to make it unlawful to use an emergency exit after having shoplifted; to provide for a penalty; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Crimes and offenses; make it unlawful to use an emergency exit after having shoplifted
Sponsors
Rep. Barry Fleming [R] | Rep. Jon Burns [R] | Rep. Christian Coomer [R] | Rep. Trey Kelley [R] |
Rep. Albert Reeves [R] | Sen. Jesse Stone [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-03-29 - Senate - Senate Vote #751 (Y: 36 N: 15 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-02-26 - House - House Vote #577 (Y: 114 N: 46 NV: 14 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2018-02-26 - House - House Vote #577 (Y: 114 N: 46 NV: 14 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-07-01 | Effective Date | |
2018-05-03 | Act 388 | |
2018-05-03 | House | House Date Signed by Governor |
2018-04-03 | House | House Sent to Governor |
2018-03-29 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted |
2018-03-29 | Senate | Senate Taken from Table |
2018-03-27 | Senate | Senate Tabled |
2018-03-19 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2018-03-19 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported |
2018-02-28 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2018-02-26 | House | House Passed/Adopted |
2018-02-26 | House | House Third Readers |
2018-02-15 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported |
2018-02-13 | House | House Second Readers |
2018-02-12 | House | House First Readers |
2018-02-08 | House | House Hopper |