GA HB894 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Passed on July 29 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Passed on July 29 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Code Section 2-4-3 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to Seed Development Commission composition, officers, bylaws, quorum, compensation, records, audit, and bonds, so as to stagger the terms of commission members; to provide for related matters; to provide for an effective date; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Seed Development Commission; stagger terms of members
Sponsors
Rep. Steven Meeks [R] | Rep. Tom McCall [R] | Rep. John Corbett [R] | Rep. Penny Houston [R] |
Rep. Clay Pirkle [R] | Sen. Sam Watson [R] | Sen. Tyler Harper [R] |
Roll Calls
2020-06-25 - House - House Vote #751 (Y: 162 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 15) [PASS]
2020-06-22 - Senate - Senate Vote #672 (Y: 46 N: 1 NV: 6 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-03-09 - House - House Vote #546 (Y: 161 N: 1 NV: 6 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2020-06-22 - Senate - Senate Vote #672 (Y: 46 N: 1 NV: 6 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-03-09 - House - House Vote #546 (Y: 161 N: 1 NV: 6 Abs: 12) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-01-01 | Effective Date | |
2020-07-29 | Act 499 | |
2020-07-29 | House | House Date Signed by Governor |
2020-07-01 | House | House Sent to Governor |
2020-06-25 | House | House Agreed Senate Amend or Sub |
2020-06-22 | Senate | Senate Transmitted House |
2020-06-22 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2020-06-22 | Senate | Senate Third Read |
2020-06-19 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2020-06-18 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2020-03-10 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2020-03-09 | House | House Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2020-03-09 | House | House Third Readers |
2020-03-04 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2020-02-28 | House | House Withdrawn, Recommitted |
2020-02-26 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported |
2020-02-18 | House | House Second Readers |
2020-02-05 | House | House First Readers |
2020-02-05 | House | House Hopper |