GA HB895 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 3 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-07-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 3 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-07-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Chapter 2 of Title 20 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to elementary and secondary education, so as to require finance directors of charter schools to participate in initial and annual training in financially operating a charter school; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Elementary and secondary education; finance directors of charter schools participate in initial and annual training; require
Sponsors
Rep. Rahn Mayo [D] | Rep. Mike Dudgeon [R] | Rep. Stacey Evans [D] | Rep. David Casas [R] |
Sen. Elena Parent [D] |
Roll Calls
2016-03-24 - Senate - Senate Vote #745 (Y: 44 N: 1 NV: 8 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2016-03-22 - Senate - Senate Vote #682 (Y: 40 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-29 - House - House Vote #694 (Y: 162 N: 8 NV: 5 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2016-03-22 - Senate - Senate Vote #682 (Y: 40 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-29 - House - House Vote #694 (Y: 162 N: 8 NV: 5 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-07-01 | Effective Date | |
2016-05-03 | Act 525 | |
2016-05-03 | House | House Date Signed by Governor |
2016-03-30 | House | House Sent to Governor |
2016-03-24 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted |
2016-03-24 | Senate | Senate Third Read |
2016-03-24 | Senate | Senate Taken from Table |
2016-03-22 | Senate | Senate Tabled |
2016-03-14 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2016-03-14 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported |
2016-03-02 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2016-02-29 | House | House Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2016-02-29 | House | House Third Readers |
2016-02-24 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2016-02-08 | House | House Second Readers |
2016-02-04 | House | House First Readers |
2016-02-03 | House | House Hopper |