GA HB897 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Passed on May 7 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Passed on May 7 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Chapter 6B of Title 10 of the O.C.G.A., relating to the "Uniform Power of Attorney Act," so as to revise the short title; to provide for definitions; to change provisions relating to the application of Chapter 6 of this title; to update cross-references to federal law; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Georgia Power of Attorney Act; revise
Sponsors
Rep. Chuck Efstration [R] | Rep. Wendell Willard [R] | Rep. Robert Trammell [D] | Rep. Greg Morris [R] |
Rep. Johnnie Caldwell [R] | Sen. John Kennedy [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-03-19 - Senate - Senate Vote #634 (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-03-01 - House - House Vote #662 (Y: 169 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2018-03-01 - House - House Vote #662 (Y: 169 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-07-01 | Effective Date | |
2018-05-07 | Act 412 | |
2018-05-07 | House | House Date Signed by Governor |
2018-04-03 | House | House Sent to Governor |
2018-03-19 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted |
2018-03-19 | Senate | Senate Third Read |
2018-03-12 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2018-03-09 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2018-02-28 | House | House Passed/Adopted |
2018-02-28 | House | House Third Readers |
2018-02-15 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported |
2018-02-13 | House | House Second Readers |
2018-02-12 | House | House First Readers |
2018-02-08 | House | House Hopper |