GA HB898 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Passed on May 7 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Passed on May 7 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Chapter 2 of Title 40 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to registration and licensing of motor vehicles, so as to revise provisions relative to fleet vehicles and fleet vehicle registration plans; to provide for definitions; to provide for fleet enrollment procedures; to provide for procedures for registering and licensing vehicles enrolled in a fleet; to provide for license plates; to remove revalidation decal requirements for vehicles in a fleet vehicle registration plan; to provide for the transfer of license plates between vehicles registered under a fleet vehicle registration plan; to provide for termination of participation in a fleet vehicle registration plan program; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Motor vehicles; fleet vehicles and fleet vehicle registration plans; revise provisions
Sponsors
Rep. Alan Powell [R] | Rep. Jason Ridley [R] | Rep. Robert Trammell [D] | Rep. James Hatchett [R] |
Sen. Tyler Harper [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-03-29 - House - House Vote #821 (Y: 169 N: 2 NV: 5 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2018-03-29 - Senate - Senate Vote #820 (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-21 - Senate - Senate Vote #654 (Y: 50 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-02-26 - House - House Vote #581 (Y: 166 N: 1 NV: 5 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2018-03-29 - Senate - Senate Vote #820 (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-21 - Senate - Senate Vote #654 (Y: 50 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-02-26 - House - House Vote #581 (Y: 166 N: 1 NV: 5 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-07-01 | Effective Date | |
2018-05-07 | Act 434 | |
2018-05-07 | House | House Date Signed by Governor |
2018-04-04 | House | House Sent to Governor |
2018-03-29 | Senate | Senate Agreed House Amend or Sub |
2018-03-29 | House | House Agreed Senate Amend or Sub As Amended |
2018-03-21 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2018-03-21 | Senate | Senate Third Read |
2018-03-15 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2018-03-14 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2018-02-28 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2018-02-26 | House | House Passed/Adopted |
2018-02-26 | House | House Third Readers |
2018-02-21 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported |
2018-02-14 | House | House Second Readers |
2018-02-13 | House | House First Readers |
2018-02-12 | House | House Hopper |