GA HB898 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 5 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-05 - House Committee Favorably Reported
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 5 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-05 - House Committee Favorably Reported
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Code Section 36-66-5 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to adoption of hearing policies and procedures and standards for exercise of zoning power, so as to allow counties and municipalities to consider the effect of a proposed zoning action on local school systems and the potential overcrowding of schools within such local school systems; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Local government; counties and municipalities to consider the effect of a proposed zoning action on local school systems; allow
Sponsors
Rep. Michael Wilensky [D] | Rep. Ron Stephens [R] | Rep. Brett Harrell [R] | Rep. Scott Holcomb [D] |
Rep. Chuck Efstration [R] | Rep. Demetrius Douglas [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-05 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported |
2020-02-19 | House | House Second Readers |
2020-02-18 | House | House First Readers |
2020-02-05 | House | House Hopper |
Georgia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.ga.gov/legislation/57241 |
Text | https://www.legis.ga.gov/api/legislation/document/20192020/189505 |