GA HB9 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on December 6 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-01-17 - House Second Readers
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on December 6 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-01-17 - House Second Readers
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Part 8 of Article 8 of Chapter 14 of Title 44 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to liens of hospitals and nursing homes, so as to allow a chiropractic practice to have a lien on a cause of action accruing to an injured person for the costs of care and treatment of injuries arising out of the cause of action; to revise definitions; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Chiropractic practice; lien on a cause of action accruing to an injured person for the costs of care and treatment of injuries arising out of the cause of action; allow
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-17 | House | House Second Readers |
2019-01-16 | House | House First Readers |
2019-01-15 | House | House Hopper |
2018-12-06 | House | House Prefiled |