GA HB901 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Passed on August 3 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-08-03 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Passed on August 3 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-08-03 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Part 1 of Article 1 of Chapter 23 of Title 50 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to general provisions regarding the Georgia Environmental Finance Authority, so as to provide for the power to make loan commitments and loans to local governments and nongovernment agencies for projects that permanently protect land and water; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Georgia Environmental Finance Authority; power to make loan commitments and loans to local governments and nongovernment agencies for projects that permanently protect land and water; provide
Sponsors
Rep. Mike Cheokas [R] | Rep. Gerald Greene [R] | Rep. Eddie Lumsden [R] | Rep. Marcus Wiedower [R] |
Rep. Lynn Smith [R] | Sen. Jeff Mullis [R] |
Roll Calls
2020-06-26 - House - House Vote #776 (Y: 168 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2020-06-25 - Senate - Senate Vote #749 (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2020-03-12 - House - House Vote #575 (Y: 165 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2020-06-25 - Senate - Senate Vote #749 (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2020-03-12 - House - House Vote #575 (Y: 165 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 12) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-08-03 | Effective Date | |
2020-08-03 | Act 545 | |
2020-08-03 | House | House Date Signed by Governor |
2020-06-30 | House | House Sent to Governor |
2020-06-26 | House | House Agreed Senate Amend or Sub |
2020-06-25 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2020-06-25 | Senate | Senate Third Read |
2020-06-25 | Senate | Senate Engrossed |
2020-06-23 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2020-06-23 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2020-06-20 | Senate | Senate Withdrawn & Recommitted |
2020-06-18 | Senate | Senate Withdrawn & Recommitted |
2020-03-13 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2020-03-12 | House | House Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2020-03-12 | House | House Third Readers |
2020-03-05 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2020-02-19 | House | House Second Readers |
2020-02-18 | House | House First Readers |
2020-02-05 | House | House Hopper |