GA HB905 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 6-1)
Status: Passed on May 3 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-07-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 6-1)
Status: Passed on May 3 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-07-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Code Section 15-11-710, Title 19, and Chapter 5 of Title 49 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to exchange of information, domestic relations, and programs and protection for children and youth, so as to change provisions relating to child abuse; to correct a cross-reference; to change and provide for defined terms; to change provisions relating to protocol committees on child abuse; to remove certain reporting requirements to the child abuse registry; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Courts; child abuse; change provisions
Sponsors
Rep. Mandi Ballinger [R] | Rep. Mary Oliver [D] | Rep. Katie Dempsey [R] | Rep. Chuck Efstration [R] |
Rep. Albert Reeves [R] | Rep. Rick Jasperse [R] | Sen. Charlie Bethel [R] |
Roll Calls
2016-03-24 - Senate - Senate Vote #765 (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2016-03-24 - House - House Vote #897 (Y: 160 N: 0 NV: 16 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2016-03-22 - Senate - Senate Vote #682 (Y: 40 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-25 - House - House Vote #611 (Y: 167 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2016-03-24 - House - House Vote #897 (Y: 160 N: 0 NV: 16 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2016-03-22 - Senate - Senate Vote #682 (Y: 40 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-25 - House - House Vote #611 (Y: 167 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-07-01 | Effective Date | |
2016-05-03 | Act 597 | |
2016-05-03 | House | House Date Signed by Governor |
2016-04-05 | House | House Sent to Governor |
2016-03-24 | House | House Agreed Senate Amend or Sub |
2016-03-24 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2016-03-24 | Senate | Senate Third Read |
2016-03-24 | Senate | Senate Taken from Table |
2016-03-22 | Senate | Senate Tabled |
2016-03-15 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2016-03-15 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2016-02-26 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2016-02-25 | House | House Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2016-02-25 | House | House Third Readers |
2016-02-18 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2016-02-08 | House | House Second Readers |
2016-02-04 | House | House First Readers |
2016-02-03 | House | House Hopper |