GA HB907 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 6-1)
Status: Passed on July 29 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-07-29 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 6-1)
Status: Passed on July 29 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-07-29 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Part 2 of Article 2 of Chapter 4 of Title 38 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to the war veterans home, so as to include an additional time period of service in the definition of "war veteran"; to provide for related matters; to provide an effective date; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Military; additional time period of service in the definition of "war veteran"; include
Sponsors
Rep. Steven Sainz [R] | Rep. Heath Clark [R] | Rep. Josh Bonner [R] | Rep. Bill Hitchens [R] |
Rep. Brian Prince [D] | Rep. Dave Belton [R] | Sen. William Ligon [R] |
Roll Calls
2020-06-22 - Senate - Senate Vote #690 (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2020-03-12 - House - House Vote #621 (Y: 159 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 18) [PASS]
2020-03-12 - House - House Vote #621 (Y: 159 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 18) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-07-29 | Effective Date | |
2020-07-29 | Act 500 | |
2020-07-29 | House | House Date Signed by Governor |
2020-06-29 | House | House Sent to Governor |
2020-06-22 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted |
2020-06-22 | Senate | Senate Third Read |
2020-06-19 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2020-06-18 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported |
2020-06-15 | Senate | Senate Withdrawn & Recommitted |
2020-03-13 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2020-03-12 | House | House Passed/Adopted |
2020-03-12 | House | House Third Readers |
2020-03-09 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported |
2020-02-19 | House | House Second Readers |
2020-02-18 | House | House First Readers |
2020-02-05 | House | House Hopper |