GA HB916 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 10 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-07-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 10 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-07-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to provide a new charter for the City of Baconton; to provide for incorporation, boundaries, and powers of the city; to provide for other matters relative to the foregoing; to repeal a specific Act; to provide for an effective date; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Baconton, City of; provide new charter
Sponsors
Rep. Jay Powell [R] |
Roll Calls
2014-03-03 - Senate - Senate Vote #529 (Y: 44 N: 5 NV: 4 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2014-02-07 - House - House Vote #490 (Y: 152 N: 0 NV: 12 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2014-02-07 - House - House Vote #490 (Y: 152 N: 0 NV: 12 Abs: 14) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-07-01 | Effective Date | |
2014-04-10 | Act 385 | |
2014-04-10 | House | House Date Signed by Governor |
2014-03-25 | House | House Sent to Governor |
2014-03-03 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted |
2014-03-03 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported |
2014-02-10 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2014-02-07 | House | House Passed/Adopted |
2014-02-07 | House | House Third Readers |
2014-02-07 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported |
2014-02-06 | House | House Second Readers |
2014-02-05 | House | House First Readers |
2014-02-04 | House | House Hopper |