GA HB918 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 4 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-03-05 - Senate Read and Referred
Pending: Senate Health and Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Article 6 of Chapter 4 of Title 26 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to pharmacies, so as to revise various provisions relating to the practice of pharmacy; to repeal provisions relating to required licensure as a pharmacy by pharmacy benefits managers engaging in the practice of pharmacy; to revise provisions relating to "The Pharmacy Audit Bill of Rights"; to revise pharmacy anti-steering provisions; to revise various provisions of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated so as to provide for conforming changes; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Pharmacies; various provisions relating to the practice of pharmacy; revise

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-03-04 - House - House Vote #526 (Y: 169 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 7) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-05SenateSenate Read and Referred
2020-03-04HouseHouse Passed/Adopted By Substitute
2020-03-04HouseHouse Third Readers
2020-02-28HouseHouse Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
2020-02-21HouseHouse Withdrawn, Recommitted
2020-02-20HouseHouse Second Readers
2020-02-19HouseHouse First Readers
2020-02-18HouseHouse Hopper

Georgia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback