GA HB92 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Passed on May 7 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Passed on May 7 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Article 2 of Chapter 32 of Title 36 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to the Georgia Municipal Courts Training Council, so as to provide that training hours completed by a municipal court judge in excess of those required may carry over to the following year; to provide for limitations; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Georgia Municipal Courts Training Council; training hours completed by a municipal court judge in excess of those required may carry over to the following year; provide
Sponsors
Rep. Dale Rutledge [R] | Rep. Barry Fleming [R] | Rep. Chuck Efstration [R] | Rep. Micah Gravley [R] |
Rep. Dave Belton [R] | Sen. Matt Brass [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-03-07 - Senate - Senate Vote #176 (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-02-13 - House - House Vote #31 (Y: 171 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-02-13 - House - House Vote #31 (Y: 171 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-07-01 | Effective Date | |
2019-05-07 | Act 239 | |
2019-05-07 | House | House Date Signed by Governor |
2019-04-04 | House | House Sent to Governor |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Senate Third Read |
2019-02-28 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2019-02-27 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported |
2019-02-14 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2019-02-13 | House | House Passed/Adopted |
2019-02-13 | House | House Third Readers |
2019-02-08 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported |
2019-02-05 | House | House Second Readers |
2019-01-30 | House | House First Readers |
2019-01-29 | House | House Hopper |