GA HB926 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Introduced on February 18 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-05 - House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 18 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-05 - House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Code Section 12-8-39 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to waste management cost reimbursement fees and surcharges, so as to increase certain solid waste disposal surcharges; to amend Code Section 12-8-40.1 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to waste management tire disposal restrictions and fees, so as to increase certain tire disposal fees; to provide for an effective date; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Solid waste management; increase certain solid waste disposal surcharges
Sponsors
Rep. Terry Rogers [R] | Rep. Jodi Lott [R] | Rep. Dominic Lariccia [R] | Rep. John Corbett [R] |
Rep. Albert Reeves [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-05 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2020-02-20 | House | House Second Readers |
2020-02-19 | House | House First Readers |
2020-02-18 | House | House Hopper |